Dos Santos, Marlise Peruzzo (CPSO#: 79928)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 20 Jul 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:Fundacao Universidade De Caxias Do Sul, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4687
Fax: (613) 761-4476
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Dos Santos Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 30 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Dos Santos ( CPSO# 79928 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Medical Imaging Department
1053 Carling Avenue
Room 01-1-10 A
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4687

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Brazil

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 20 Jul 2006 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 22 Sep 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 16 Sep 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Dec 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 May 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Dec 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 15 May 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 15 May 2014 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Marlise Peruzzo Dos Santos may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Radiology,  University  of Ottawa, in which Dr. Dos Santos holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Dos Santos
                  no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.