Dosch, Elisabeth (CPSO#: 42376)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:Philipps University at Marburg, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 15 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 2014