Dossetor, Clare Brigid (CPSO#: 57380)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Oct 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Oct 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Alberta, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 203
381 Kent Street
Ottawa ON  K2P 2A8
Phone: (613) 567-8459
Fax: (613) 567-4819
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Clare Dossetor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 04 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Dossetor ( CPSO# 57380 )

Business Address:
203 - 381 Kent Street
Ottawa ON  K2P 2A8
Phone Number: (613) 567-8459

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 13 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CLARE BRIGID DOSSETOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOSSETOR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 1988