Dost, Rehan (CPSO#: 68002)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 3
139 Grand River Street
Paris ON  N3L 2M4
Phone: (519) 442-0668
Fax: (519) 442-6199
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rehan Dost Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 29 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Dost ( CPSO# 68002 )

Business Address:
139 Grand River Street North
Paris ON  N3L 2M4
Phone Number: (519) 442-0668

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REHAN DOST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOST is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999