Dotten, Dale Allan (CPSO#: 19327)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Oct 1964

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 1969

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Room 2-080 Queen Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-3054
Fax: (416) 864-5127
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Nov 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DALE ALLAN DOTTEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOTTEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1962
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Aug 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1969