Doucet, Jay Joseph (CPSO#: 59866)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 25 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 1997