Doucet, Rene (CPSO#: 101952)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centre hospitalier Universite Laval
2705, boulevard Laurier
Department of Psychiatry (RC157)
Quebec, Quebec
Quebec QC  G1V 4G2
Phone: (418) 654-2121

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RENE DOUCET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOUCET is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 09 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 05 Sep 2014
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2013