Doucette, Jacquelyn Marriott (CPSO#: 64971)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
436 Waterloo Street
London ON  N6B 2P2
Phone: (519) 438-5551
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Doucette Gray Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 02 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Doucette ( CPSO# 64971 )
Dr. D. Gray ( CPSO# 64975 )

Business Address:
Room E2-217
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 667-6583

Business Address:
436 Waterloo Street
London ON  N6B 2P2
Phone Number: (519) 438-5551

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACQUELYN MARRIOTT DOUCETTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOUCETTE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1993
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2010