Douen, Andre Gene (CPSO#: 66918)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Miami, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 303
101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone: (905) 848-2350
Fax: (905) 848-8506
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Trillium Health Centre
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Canada
Phone: (905) 848-7557
Fax: (905) 848-7669
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andre Douen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Douen ( CPSO# 66918 )

Business Address:
Suite 303
101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 848-2350

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDRE GENE DOUEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOUEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Research Fellows - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1997