Doufle, Ghislaine Yawavi (CPSO#: 97121)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Dec 2014

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 03 Dec 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Universite Pierre et Marie Curie, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Critical Care
Medicine
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-3601
Electoral District: 10

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 19 Mar 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 20 Mar 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Sep 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 27 Jun 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Ghislaine Yawavi Doufle may practise medicine only as required by the
                  clinical fellowship program in Critical Care Medicine in which Dr. Doufle
                  is  enrolled  in  the  Division  of Critical Care Medicine, University of
                  Toronto;

            2.    Dr. Doufle shall prescribe drugs only  for in-patients or out-patients of
                  a clinical teaching unit that is formally  affiliated with the department
                  where  Dr.  Doufle  is  properly  practising  medicine   and   to   which
                  postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of
                  its program of postgraduate medical education;

            3.    Dr. Doufle shall not charge a fee for medical services, and

            4.    The certificate expires on June 30, 2018.