Dougherty, Stephen Hugh (CPSO#: 53922)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mountain View Medical Clinic
Suite 210
9737 Macleod Trail SW
Calgary AB  T2J 0P6
Phone: (403) 454-3770
Fax: (403) 454-3771
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

South Health Campus Hospital
Family Medicine Teaching Centre
4th Floor Outpatient Tower Module A
4448 Front Street SE
Calgary AB  T3M 1M4
Canada
Phone: 403 956 2330
Fax: 403 476 9624
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Records Location

Address: Mountain View Medical Clinic 9737 Macleod Trail SW Calgary AB T2J 0P6
Date Received: 31 May 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017