Douglas, Brian Claude (CPSO#: 27371)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jun 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
6624 Fannin
Suite 2560
Houston TX  77030
United States
Phone: (713) 796-0062
Fax: (713) 796-9187

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California
USA - Texas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN CLAUDE DOUGLAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOUGLAS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1975
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 03 Feb 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1987