Douglas, Carol Jean (CPSO#: 20861)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: Boudreau, Carol Jean (used until: 15 Sep 1997 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 07 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Mar 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jun 1999