Douglas, John Hugh Cameron (CPSO#: 11502)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1943

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1951 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 1944
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Oct 1947
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1948
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 May 1967
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 May 1989