Douglas, Myrtle Joanne (CPSO#: 21877)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Apr 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Apr 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 26 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Apr 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Apr 2004