Douglas, Simone Ann (CPSO#: 67288)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Aug 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 210
955 Major MacKenzie Drive
Vaughan ON  L6A 4P9
Phone: (905) 832-2201
Fax: (905) 832-2246
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Simone Douglas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 23 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Douglas ( CPSO# 67288 )

Business Address:
Suite 210
955 Major MacKenzie Drive
Vaughan ON  L6A 4P9
Phone Number: (905) 832-2201

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIMONE ANN DOUGLAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOUGLAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 03 Aug 1993 to 02 Aug 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 03 Aug 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1995