Douglass, Alan Bruce (CPSO#: 42808)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Aug 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Ottawa Hospital
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone: (613) 722-6521 Ext. 6226
Fax: (613) 798-2980
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.B. Douglass Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 21 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Douglass ( CPSO# 42808 )

Business Address:
Royal Ottawa Hospital
Suite 3124
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone Number: (613) 722-6521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 07 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALAN BRUCE DOUGLASS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOUGLASS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Dec 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2001