Douketis, James Demetrios (CPSO#: 59872)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue East
Room F-544
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 521-6178
Fax: (905) 521-6068
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES DEMETRIOS DOUKETIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOUKETIS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1989