Doumit, Gaby Doumit (CPSO#: 77460)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jan 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jan 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1506 Docteur Penfield
montreal QC  H3G 1B9
Phone: 514 932 8200

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GABY DOUMIT DOUMIT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOUMIT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2012