Doumit, Joseph (CPSO#: 88395)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Apr 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Apr 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1191 Union Ave
Montreal QC  H3B3C3
Phone: (514)400-3291 Ext. 2

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH DOUMIT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOUMIT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2014