Douville, Linda Audrey (CPSO#: 62459)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
"O" Division RCMP Health Services
345 Harry Walker Parkway South
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8P6
Phone: 905-953-7685
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Linda Douville Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 22 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Douville ( CPSO# 62459 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS Canada 111 St. Regis Crescent South Toronto ON M3J 1Y6 Tel: 1-888-563-3732 Email: info@rsrs.com
Date Received: 02 Mar 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINDA AUDREY DOUVILLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOUVILLE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1991