Dove, Carin Jeanne (CPSO#: 88505)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Dec 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 2013

Summary

Former Name: Gouws, Carin Jeanne (used until: 20 Jan 2010 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Sleep Disorders Clinic
55 Frid Street, Unit 7
Hamilton ON  L8P 4M3
Phone: (905) 529-2259
Fax: (905) 529-2262
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CARIN JEANNE DOVE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOVE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2013