Dove, Marion Whitney (CPSO#: 70530)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Aug 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1997 to 30 Nov 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Jul 1998