Dover, Jeffrey Steven (CPSO#: 50455)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Apr 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Apr 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 20 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Apr 2005