Dower, Andrea Mary (CPSO#: 89097)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 46698
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

726 Upper James Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Z9
Canada
Phone: (905) 575-5743
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 46698
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L9H 6X1
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 46698
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrea Dower Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 02 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dower ( CPSO# 89097 )

Business Address:
GHA Surgical Centre
726 Upper James Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Z9

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Hamilton General/Juravinski Cancer
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
McMaster University Medical Centre
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4N6
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREA MARY DOWER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOWER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2008