Dowey, Michael Timothy John (CPSO#: 67458)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 11 Aug 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1993
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 Oct 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2002
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2007