Dowling, Shawn Kenneth (CPSO#: 82357)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 01 Mar 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Mar 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 03 May 2005 to 27 May 2005
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 15 Sep 2007 to 01 Mar 2008
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 May 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 May 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Mar 2008