Down, Jonathan Charles (CPSO#: 50456)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St.Bartholomew's Hospital Medical Coll., 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 20 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1992