Down, Nancy King (CPSO#: 32556)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Feb 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 218
North York ON  M2J 1V1
Phone: (416) 491-0345
Fax: (416) 491-7557
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nancy K. Down Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 01 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Soutter ( CPSO# 31457 )
Dr. N. Down ( CPSO# 32556 )

Business Address:
218 - 1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone Number: (416) 491-0345


Corporation Name: D. Ian Soutter Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 05 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Soutter ( CPSO# 31457 )
Dr. N. Down ( CPSO# 32556 )

Business Address:
611 - 581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone Number: (905) 853-4448

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 17 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NANCY KING DOWN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOWN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 1986