Downar, Eugene (CPSO#: 26167)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Sep 1973

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Sep 1973

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Pmcc 3 - 552
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4982
Fax: (416) 595-1811
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Eugene Downar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 29 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Downar ( CPSO# 26167 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
552 - 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4982

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 21 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EUGENE DOWNAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOWNAR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 1967
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Jul 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 1976