Downar, Jonathan (CPSO#: 83026)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Calgary, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
rTMS Clinic
Room 7M 415
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5667
Fax: (416) 603-5292
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jonathan Downar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 13 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Downar ( CPSO# 83026 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
Neuropsychiatry Clinic
Room 7M-415
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5667

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN DOWNAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOWNAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010