Downe Schwanz, Joan Irene (CPSO#: 29698)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 May 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 May 2004

Summary

Former Names: Pivnick, Joan Irene (used until: 02 Nov 1995 )     Downe, Joan Irene (used until: 01 Apr 1990 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1983 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Oct 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 May 2004