Downey, Donal Bernard (CPSO#: 61662)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Feb 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Medical Imaging
Royal Inland Hospital
311 Columbia Street
Kamloops BC  V2C 2T1
Phone: (250) 314-2100 Ext. 2404
Fax: (250) 314-2732

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 13 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DONAL BERNARD DOWNEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOWNEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 1991