Downey, James Frederick (CPSO#: 55383)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 464-2891
Fax: (705) 434-2258
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Stevenson Memorial Hospital
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston ON  L9R 1W7
Canada
Phone: (705) 435-6281
Fax: (705) 434-2258
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. James Downey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 16 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Downey ( CPSO# 55383 )

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
D2 - 825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7

Business Address:
Stevenson Memorial Hospital
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston ON  L9R 1W7

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 13 Sep 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES FREDERICK DOWNEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOWNEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Medical Microbiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986