Downey, Mathew Tindal (CPSO#: 50460)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Quinte Health Care
P O Box 428
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone: (613) 969-7400 Ext. 2860
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lennox and Addington County General
8 Richmond Park Dr
Napanee, ON
Napanee ON  K7R 2Z4
Canada
Phone: (613) 354-3301
County: County of Lennox and Addington
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare North Hastings,Bancroft Bancroft
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 27 May 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATHEW TINDAL DOWNEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOWNEY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 21 Jun 1982 to 20 Jun 1983
Other - Rotating Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1983