Downie, David Coleman (CPSO#: 64176)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Aug 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Avenue Medical Centre
221 Brant Avenue
Brantford ON  N3T 3J2
Phone: (519) 753-8666
Fax: (519) 753-5672
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Downie, Thompson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 10 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Thompson ( CPSO# 54979 )
Dr. C. Roye ( CPSO# 61763 )
Dr. D. Lowcock ( CPSO# 30284 )
Dr. D. Downie ( CPSO# 64176 )
Dr. K. Bates ( CPSO# 50121 )
Dr. C. Cowan ( CPSO# 60712 )

Business Address:
Avenue Medical Centre
221 Brant Avenue
Brantford ON  N3T 3J2
Phone Number: (519) 753-8666


Corporation Name: Dr. David Downie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 10 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Downie ( CPSO# 64176 )

Business Address:
Suite 124
221 Brant Avenue
Brantford ON  N3T 3J3
Phone Number: (519) 753-8666

Business Address:
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 751-5544

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 04 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID COLEMAN DOWNIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOWNIE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1992