Downton, Geoffrey Francis (CPSO#: 43015)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 7 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1999