Doyle, Crystal Rosanne (CPSO#: 81124)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Oct 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Oct 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Winchester District Hospital
566 Louise St.
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone: 613 774 2422
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Crystal Doyle Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 30 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Doyle ( CPSO# 81124 )

Business Address:
Winchester District Memorial Hospital
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone Number: (613) 774-2420

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 06 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CRYSTAL ROSANNE DOYLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOYLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Nov 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Jan 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2014