Doyle, Jeffrey Donald (CPSO#: 88049)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Nov 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 204
145 Queenston Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 2Z9
Phone: (905) 641-5700
Fax: (905) 641-0074
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeffrey Doyle Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 06 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Doyle ( CPSO# 88049 )

Business Address:
Suite 204
145 Queenston Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 2Z9
Phone Number: (905) 641-5700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel-Dieu-Shaver Health and Rehabilitation Centre St Catharines
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY DONALD DOYLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOYLE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Feb 2008 to 29 Feb 2008
Elective Trainee - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Feb 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 2009