Doyle, John Joseph Paul (CPSO#: 43012)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jun 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CancerCare Manitoba
675 McDermot Avenue
Winnipeg MB  R3E 0V9
Phone: (204) 787-4009
Fax: (204) 786-0195

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematology Effective: 23 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatrics Effective: 19 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN JOSEPH PAUL DOYLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOYLE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 1987