Doyle, Patricia Marian (CPSO#: 32976)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Nov 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Nov 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2000 Credit Valley Road
Suite 502
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Phone: (905) 820-8748
Fax: (905) 820-0255
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P.M. Doyle Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 05 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Doyle ( CPSO# 32976 )

Business Address:
Suite 502
2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Phone Number: (905) 820-8748

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 17 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICIA MARIAN DOYLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOYLE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 1981