Drab, Stephen Anthony (CPSO#: 78202)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Aug 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Aug 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
250 Wincott Drive, Unit 12
Toronto ON  M9R 2R5
Phone: (416) 249-0002
Fax: (416) 249-0842
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN ANTHONY DRAB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DRAB is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2004