Dragan, Adriana (CPSO#: 85210)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Oct 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:Institute of Medicine, Pharmacy,Iasi, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peak Family Medical
Suite 209
400 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 0H7
Phone: (905) 636-1888
Fax: (905) 636-1124
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist
Public Health and Preventive Medicine Effective: 18 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADRIANA DRAGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DRAGAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2009