Dragoi, Laura (CPSO#: 108650)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Mar 2016

Expiry Date:  28 Mar 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 18 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Hamburg University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Dept of Critical Care Medicine
D Wing Room D1 08
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURA DRAGOI may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. DRAGOI is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. DRAGOI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. DRAGOI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. DRAGOI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. DRAGOI ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. DRAGOI ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 28 Mar 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 28 Mar 2016 to 17 Jun 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 18 Jun 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 28 Mar 2018
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 29 Mar 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Mar 2018