Dragomir, Alina Roxana (CPSO#: 77222)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jan 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Institute Medicine, Pharmacy,Timisoara, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Cent
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Canada
Phone: (519) 822-5350
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

Hamilton Health Sciences
Hamilton General Hospital Site
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Canada
Phone: (905) 527-4322
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Hamilton Health Sciences
McMaster & Children's Hospital
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Canada
Phone: (519) 822-5350
Fax: (519) 822-2170
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Dragomir Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 11 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dragomir ( CPSO# 77222 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences
Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Business Address:
McMaster University
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 822-5350

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALINA ROXANA DRAGOMIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DRAGOMIR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 07 Jan 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006