Drake, Deborah Anne (CPSO#: 55850)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Sep 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 1987
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2008
Terms and conditions amended Effective: 12 Aug 2009
Suspension of registration imposed: Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 16 Feb 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Sep 2011

Pending Discipline Hearings

Summary: On January 24, 2011, the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee referred the matter of Dr. Drake's capacity to the Fitness to Practise Committee.

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 12 Aug 2009
Summary:

 On August 12, 2009, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Drake committed an act of professional 
 misconduct, in that she failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession.

Dr. Drake 
 obtained certification from the College of Family Physicians of Canada in Family Medicine and 
 Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine). She provides primary care to patients and has a private 
 Complementary Medicine practice. Dr. Drake failed to maintain the standard of practice of the 
 profession in that she prescribed conventional treatment modalities without a conventional 
 indication and without: performing a pertinent history and physical examination of the patient 
 sufficient to make or confirm a conventional diagnosis and to meet the appropriate standard of the 
 profession; investigating, when necessary, utilizing generally accepted modalities pertinent to 
 the complaint; reaching a conventional diagnosis that reasonable physicians would reach, supported 
 by the data; advising the patient of the usual and conventional treatment options, their risks, 
 benefits and efficacy as reflected by current knowledge; documenting all of the above in 
 accordance with the regulations; and providing sufficient information to allow patients to make 
 informed choices.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1. The terms of the 
 Undertaking executed by Dr. Drake, attached to the Order as Appendix "A", be terms, conditions and 
 limitations imposed on Dr. Drake's certificate of registration (Note: Appendix A containing Dr. 
 Drake(s complete undertaking is contained in full decision pdf).

2. The results of the proceeding 
 be included in the register.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): August 12, 2009

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: September 16, 2011
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Deborah Drake having resigned from the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario effective September 16, 2011, undertakes never to re-apply for a license in Ontario.