Drake, Robert Michael (CPSO#: 20507)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Aug 1966

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 31 Aug 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2679 Howard Ave.
Windsor ON  N8X 3X2
Phone: (519) 972-7065
Fax: (519) 971 0567
Electoral District: 01

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1973 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1966
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 31 Aug 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 31 Aug 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from August 31, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Robert Michael Drake,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Drake to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                              DR. ROBERT MICHAEL DRAKE
                                          ("Dr. Drake")
                  
                                                to
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public;
                  
                  "QAC" means the Quality Assurance Committee of the College.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Drake, certificate of registration number 20507, am a member of
                  the College.  I acknowledge that concerns have been identified with
                  respect to my recordkeeping in my work as a psychotherapist. I am aware
                  of the College's concern about protecting the public.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (3)   I, Dr. Drake, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective August 31, 2017 ("Effective Date").

            (4)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Drake, undertake that I will not treat any patients in any
                        capacity. 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Drake, undertake that I will not prescribe medication to any
                        person.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Drake, undertake that the entirety of my scope of practice
                        will be limited to engaging in work as a coroner in Ontario.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Drake, undertake that I will not engage in any practice of
                        medicine that is not expressly and specifically listed in section
                        (4)(c) above.
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (5)   I, Dr. Drake, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (6)   I, Dr. Drake, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (7)   I, Dr. Drake, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to the Office of the Chief Coroner of Ontario.

            (8)   I, Dr. Drake, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in any one or more of the following:
                  consideration by the QAC, an investigation by the College, or further
                  action by the College, including a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            (9)   I, Dr. Drake, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (10)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Drake, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Drake, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (10)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Drake's
                              recordkeeping in his work as a psychotherapist. Dr. Drake has
                              ceased to practice as a psychotherapist and has limited his
                              practice to coroner work. Dr. Drake will not treat any
                              patients in any capacity or prescribe any medication to any
                              person. 
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (11)  I, Dr. Drake, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that
                  may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                  compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (12)  I, Dr. Drake, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
                  attached hereto as Appendix "A" and that the consent forms part of this
                  Undertaking.

            (13)  I, Dr. Drake, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  Office of the Chief Coroner of Ontario with any information arising from
                  the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (14)  I, Dr. Drake, give my irrevocable consent to the Office of the Chief
                  Coroner of Ontario to disclose to the College all information relevant to
                  this Undertaking and/or relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                  compliance with this Undertaking.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: August 31, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Robert Michael Drake to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective August 31, 2017:

Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Drake’s recordkeeping in his work as a psychotherapist. Dr. Drake has ceased to practice as a psychotherapist and has limited his practice to coroner work. Dr. Drake will not treat any patients in any capacity or prescribe any medication to any person.