Drakos, Demetrios (CPSO#: 70178)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Plastic and Reconstructive Surgery
Suite 223
217 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G8
Phone: (519) 753-0085
Fax: (519) 753-7399
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEMETRIOS DRAKOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DRAKOS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001