Draper, David Edward (CPSO#: 66017)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 09 Sep 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Sep 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 13 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 29 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 1994
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Sep 2008