Dresser, Carl Kenneth (CPSO#: 16158)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Indonesian

Education:Queen's University, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1981 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1957
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Dec 1964
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jun 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2005